+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On April 20, 2006 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 402.
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Domenici under authority of the order of the Senate of 04/07/2006 without amendment. With written report No. 109-240 .
On March 8, 2006 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On February 16, 2006 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 109-381.
On February 7, 2006 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor