+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On November 10, 1998 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 105-364.
- Signed by President.
On November 4, 1998 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On October 15, 1998 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On October 15, 1998 in the Senate:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On passage Passed without objection.
- Mr. Hansen asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
- Considered by unanimous consent.
- Committee on Resources discharged.
On October 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 105-400 .
On October 8, 1998 in the House:
- Received in the House.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Referred to the House Committee on Resources.
On October 7, 1998 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On September 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 628.
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Murkowski without amendment. Without written report.
On September 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On September 17, 1998 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Parks, Preservation and Recreation. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 105-801.
On September 3, 1998 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources requested executive comment from Department of the Interior, OMB.
On June 29, 1998 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Parks, Preservation and Recreation.
On June 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor