+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On August 21, 1986 in the Senate:
- Committee on Governmental Affairs received executive comment from Federal Home Loan Bank Board.
On August 1, 1986 in the Senate:
- Committee on Governmental Affairs received executive comment from CBO.
On July 31, 1986 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 744.
- Committee on Governmental Affairs. Reported to Senate by Senator Roth with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. With written report No. 99-347. Additional views filed.
On June 27, 1986 in the Senate:
- Committee on Governmental Affairs received executive comment from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.
On June 25, 1986 in the Senate:
- Committee on Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On June 6, 1986 in the Senate:
- Committee on Governmental Affairs received executive comment from Federal Home Loan Bank Board.
On May 19, 1986 in the Senate:
- Committee on Governmental Affairs received executive comment from OTA.
On May 14, 1986 in the Senate:
- Committee on Governmental Affairs. Hearings held.
On May 13, 1986 in the Senate:
- Committee on Governmental Affairs. Hearings held.
- Committee on Governmental Affairs received executive comment from OMB.
On May 12, 1986 in the Senate:
- Committee on Governmental Affairs received executive comment from GAO.
On April 25, 1986 in the Senate:
- Committee on Governmental Affairs requested executive comment from Office of Technology Assessment, Office of Management and Budget, Office of Federal Procurement Policy, Agriculture Department, Commerce Department, Defense Department, Education Department, Energy Department, Health and Human Services Department, HUD, Interior Department, Justice Department, Labor Department, State Department, Transportation Department, Treasury Department.
- Committee on Governmental Affairs requested executive comment from Environmental Protection Agency, Export-Import Bank of the United States, Farm Credit Administration, Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Federal Home Loan Bank Board, Federal Reserve System, General Services Administration, NASA, National Credit Union Administration, Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation, Small Business Administration, Tennessee Valley Authority, U.S. Postal Service, Veterans' Administration, General Accounting Office, Congressional Budget Office.
On March 26, 1986 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Governmental Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor