+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On September 28, 1984 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 98-428.
- Signed by President.
On September 21, 1984 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On September 17, 1984 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
On September 13, 1984 in the House:
- Reported to House by House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs. Report No: 98-1019 .
- Executive Comment Requested from Interior.
On September 12, 1984 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on Public Lands and National Parks Discharged.
On September 6, 1984 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Public Lands and National Parks.
On August 21, 1984 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Forest, Family Farms, and Energy.
On August 10, 1984 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
- Referred to House Committee on Agriculture.
On August 9, 1984 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
On August 6, 1984 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 1104.
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Baker for Senator McClure with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 98-581. Additional views filed.
On August 1, 1984 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On April 12, 1984 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources received executive comment from Agriculture Department. Favorable.
On February 9, 1984 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Public Lands and Reserved Water. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 98-779.
On January 10, 1984 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources requested executive comment from Interior Department, OMB.
On December 6, 1983 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources requested executive comment from Agriculture Department, OMB.
On November 18, 1983 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor