+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (22)
On December 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 115-299.
- Signed by President.
On November 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On November 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On November 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate agreed to the House amendment to S. 2152 by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7065-7066)
On October 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate bill.
On September 28, 2018 in the House:
- On passage Passed without objection.
- H.Amdt.974 On agreeing to the Marino amendment (A001) Agreed to without objection.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H9369-9373; text of measure as introduced: CR H9369-9371)
- H.Amdt.974 Amendment (A001) offered by Mr. Marino. (consideration: CR H9371-9373; text: CR H9371-9373)
- Mr. Marino asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
- Committee on the Judiciary discharged.
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
- Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
- Received in the House.
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 293.
- Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Grassley with amendments. Without written report.
On January 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
On November 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
+ − Amendments (2)
All Actions
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
H.Amdt.974
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor