+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On December 7, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 811.
On November 19, 2004 in the Senate:
- Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator McCain with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
- Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On September 22, 2004 in the Senate:
- Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation Subcommittee on Communications. Hearings held.
On March 23, 2004 in the Senate:
On February 27, 2004 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor