+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (5)
On December 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- By Senator Vitter from Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship filed written report under authority of the order of the Senate of 12/10/2016. Report No. 114-414.
On December 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 310.
- Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Reported by Senator Vitter with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
On October 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On October 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.