+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On October 9, 1980 in the Senate:
- Public Law 96-401.
- Signed by President.
On October 1, 1980 in the Senate:
- Measure presented to President.
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On October 1, 1980 in the House:
- Measure enrolled in House.
On September 29, 1980 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
- Measure passed House.
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up by consent calendar in House.
On September 23, 1980 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs, H. Rept. 96-1370.
On August 20, 1980 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
On August 18, 1980 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate, amended.
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Call of calendar in Senate.
On August 1, 1980 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Select Committee on Indian Affairs with amendment, S. Rept. 96-883.
On December 12, 1979 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Select Committee on Indian Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor