+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On October 17, 1976 in the Senate:
- Public law 94-527.
- Signed by President.
On October 7, 1976 in the Senate:
- Measure presented to President.
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On October 6, 1976 in the House:
- Measure enrolled in House.
On October 1, 1976 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
- Senate agreed to House amendments.
On September 27, 1976 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended, in lieu of H.R. 15122 .
- Measure considered in House.
- Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs discharged in House.
On August 25, 1976 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
On August 24, 1976 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate.
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Call of calendar in Senate.
On August 10, 1976 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs, S. Rept. 94-1143.
On July 15, 1975 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor