+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On August 19, 1994 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 591.
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Johnston with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 103-350.
On August 3, 1994 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On July 12, 1994 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources received executive comment from National Aeronautics and Space Administration. Favorable.
On June 28, 1994 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Energy Research and Development. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 103-682.
On June 16, 1994 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources requested executive comment from National Aeronautics Administration, Deparatment of Health and Human Services, and Office of Management and Budget.
On June 7, 1994 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources requested executive comment from Department of Energy, Department of Education, National Science Foundation, and Office of Management and Budget.
On May 12, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Energy Research and Development.
On May 11, 1994 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor