+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (27)
On June 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 117-133.
- Signed by President.
On June 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On May 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 418 - 0 (Roll no. 228). (text: CR H5115-5116)
On May 18, 2022 in the House:
- Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 418 - 0 (Roll no. 228).
- Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5171-5172)
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2102.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5115-5117)
- Mr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On March 28, 2022 in the House:
- Received in the House.
- Held at the desk.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On March 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S1783-1784)
- Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.(text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S1783-1784)
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S1783-1784)
- Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
- Amendment SA 5014 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- Amendment SA 5014 proposed by Senator Schumer for Senator Boozman. (consideration: CR S1783-1784; text: CR S1783-1784) In the nature of a substitute.
- Senate amendment proposed (on the floor): Amendment SA 5014 proposed by Senator Schumer for Senator Boozman.(consideration: CR S1783-1784; text: CR S1783-1784)
- Senate amendment agreed to: Amendment SA 5014 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- Senate amendment submitted
On July 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On June 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
On June 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
- Introduced in Senate
+ − Amendments (2)
SA 5014
In the nature of a substitute.
S.Amdt.5014
In the nature of a substitute.
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor