+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 10, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Recreation and Public Lands.
On March 5, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Resources.
- Received in the House.
On March 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On March 4, 2003 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On February 11, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 15.
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Domenici without amendment. With written report No. 108-7 .
On February 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On January 23, 2003 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor