+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On August 12, 1992 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Intellectual Property and Judicial Administration.
On August 4, 1992 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Judiciary.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Received in the House.
On August 3, 1992 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
On July 30, 1992 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 580.
- Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Biden with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
- Committee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On November 26, 1991 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor