+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On October 2, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Basic Research.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Space and Aeronautics.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Environment.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Technology.
On September 22, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to House Agriculture
- Referred to House Resources
- Referred to House Commerce
- Referred to House Science
- Referred to the Committee on Science, and in addition to the Committees on Commerce, Resources, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Received in the House.
On September 22, 2000 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On September 21, 2000 in the Senate:
- S.AMDT.4176 Amendment SA 4176 proposed by Senator Smith NH for Senator Frist. To increase the Federal investment in civilian research and development.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- S.AMDT.4176 Amendment SA 4176 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- The committee substitute as amended agreed to by Unanimous Consent.
On June 16, 2000 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 607.
- Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported to Senate by Senator McCain with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 106-310 .
On April 13, 2000 in the Senate:
- Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On March 1, 2000 in the Senate:
- Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation Subcommittee on Science, Technology and Space. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 106-1091.
On February 9, 2000 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.4176
To increase the Federal investment in civilian research and development.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor