+ − Summary
+ − Actions (6)
On September 24, 1992 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 704.
- Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Biden without amendment. With written report No. 102-423. Additional and minority views filed.
On August 12, 1992 in the Senate:
- Committee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On May 6, 1992 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Antitrust, Monopolies and Business. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 102-784.
On January 23, 1992 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Antitrust, Monopolies and Business.
On November 25, 1991 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor