+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 115-176.
- Signed by President.
On May 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On May 22, 2018 in the House:
- Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 5515, S. 204 and S. 2155. The resolution provides for one hour of general debate on H.R. 5515, S. 204 and S. 2155. The resolution provides for consideration of S. 2155 and S. 204 under a closed rule. Also, the resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 5515 under a structured rule and makes an amendment in the nature of a substitute consisting of the text of Rules Committee Print 115-70 considered as adopted.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On passage Passed by recorded vote: 250 - 169 (Roll no. 214). (text: CR H4355-4356)
- On motion to recommit with instructions Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 187 - 231 (Roll no. 213).
- The previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the motion to recommit with instructions. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House with an amendment to strike everything after section 1 and insert a completely new text.
- Ms. Schakowsky moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on Energy and Commerce. (CR H4363)
- The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on S. 204.
- Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 905. (consideration: CR H4355-4366)
On May 21, 2018 in the House:
- Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 905 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 5515, S. 204 and S. 2155. The resolution provides for one hour of general debate on H.R. 5515, S. 204 and S. 2155. The resolution provides for consideration of S. 2155 and S. 204 under a closed rule. Also, the resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 5515 under a structured rule and makes an amendment in the nature of a substitute consisting of the text of Rules Committee Print 115-70 considered as adopted.
On August 11, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On August 4, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
- Received in the House.
On August 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- S.Amdt.753 Amendment SA 753 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- S.Amdt.753 Amendment SA 753 proposed by Senator Johnson. (consideration: CR S4788-4789; text: CR S4788-4789) In the nature of a substitute.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S4788-4789)
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
+ − Amendments (2)
SA 753
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
S.Amdt.753
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
+ − Sponsors (47)
Type:
Primary Sponsor