+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On September 9, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to House Energy and Commerce
On September 4, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to House Science
- Referred to the Committee on Science, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Held at the desk.
- Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure
On July 22, 2002 in the House:
- Received in the House.
On July 22, 2002 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On July 18, 2002 in the Senate:
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 459.
- S.AMDT.4311 Amendment SA 4311 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- S.AMDT.4311 Amendment SA 4311 proposed by Senator Reid for Senator Wyden. To ensure that private sector input is considered in the wireless communications capabilities policy options report required by section 6.
- The committee substitute as amended agreed to by Unanimous Consent.
On June 27, 2002 in the Senate:
- Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Hollings with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 107-186 .
- Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
On May 17, 2002 in the Senate:
- Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation Subcommittee on Science, Technology, and Space. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 107-1070.
On April 24, 2002 in the Senate:
On March 20, 2002 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.4311
To ensure that private sector input is considered in the wireless communications capabilities policy options report required by section 6.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor