+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (12)
On October 17, 2002 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 738.
- Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Inouye with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 107-321 .
On October 11, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
On October 7, 2002 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 637.
- Senate Committee on Indian Affairs discharged. pursuant to the order of March 14, 2002.
On September 17, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs pursuant to the order of March 14, 2002.
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Bingaman with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 107-285 .
On July 31, 2002 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
On April 24, 2002 in the Senate:
- Committees on Energy and Natural Resources; Indian Affairs. Joint hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 107-548.
On March 18, 2002 in the Senate:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
On March 14, 2002 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred jointly to the Committees on Energy and Natural Resources; Indian Affairs pursuant to the order of March 14, 2002, with instructions that if one Committee reports, the other Committee have twenty calendar days, excluding any period where the Senate is not in session for more than three days, to report or be discharged.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor