+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On July 26, 2012 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 112-149.
- Signed by President.
On July 19, 2012 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On July 17, 2012 in the House:
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2009 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Ms. Ros-Lehtinen moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- Considered as unfinished business.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 378 - 11 .
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On January 6, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Commercial and Administrative Law.
On December 16, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to House Education and the Workforce
- Referred to House Judiciary
- Referred to House Foreign Affairs
- Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Received in the House.
On December 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor