+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (32)
On May 9, 2000 in the Senate:
- S.AMDT.3139 Amendment SA 3139 proposed by Senator Stevens. To provide for early learning programs, and for other purposes.
- S.AMDT.3126 Amendment SA 3126 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 97 - 0.
- S.AMDT.3127 Amendment SA 3127 proposed by Senator Lieberman. To improve the bill.
- S.AMDT.3126 Considered by Senate.
- Considered by Senate.
- S.AMDT.3127 Amendment SA 3127 not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 13 - 84.
On May 8, 2000 in the Senate:
- S.AMDT.3104 Amendment SA 3104 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- S.AMDT.3104 Amendment SA 3104 proposed by Senator Collins. To modify the list of eligible programs that may be subject to a performance partnership agreement.
- S.AMDT.3126 Amendment SA 3126 proposed by Senator Coverdell for Senator Lott. To improve the provisions relating to teachers.
- Considered by Senate.
On May 4, 2000 in the Senate:
- S.AMDT.3118 Amendment SA 3118 proposed by Senator Kennedy to Amendment SA 3117. To provide for merit school programs for rewarding all teachers in schools that improve student achievement for all students.
- S.AMDT.3117 Amendment SA 3117 proposed by Senator Abraham. To reform certain State requirements relating to the use of funds to improve student academic achievement and student performance and to coordinate professional development activities.
- Considered by Senate.
- S.AMDT.3122 Amendment SA 3122 proposed by Senator Murray. To provide for class size reduction programs.
- S.AMDT.3118 Amendment SA 3118 not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 43 - 54.
- S.AMDT.3117 Amendment SA 3117 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 54 - 42.
- S.AMDT.3122 Amendment SA 3122 not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 44 - 53.
On May 3, 2000 in the Senate:
- S.AMDT.3111 Amendment SA 3111 not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 45 - 54.
- S.AMDT.3110 Amendment SA 3110 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 98 - 0.
- S.AMDT.3111 Amendment SA 3111 proposed by Senator Daschle. To improve the bill.
- S.AMDT.3110 Amendment SA 3110 proposed by Senator Gorton. To strengthen the Academic Achievement for All Demonstration Act .
- Considered by Senate.
On May 2, 2000 in the Senate:
- Considered by Senate.
On May 1, 2000 in the Senate:
- Measure laid before Senate.
On April 12, 2000 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 491.
- Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported to Senate by Senator Jeffords with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 106-261 . Additional and Minority views filed.
On March 9, 2000 in the Senate:
- Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On March 8, 2000 in the Senate:
- Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Committee consideration and Mark Up Session held.
On March 7, 2000 in the Senate:
- Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Committee consideration and Mark Up Session held.
On March 1, 2000 in the Senate:
- Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Committee consideration and Mark Up Session held.
On January 19, 1999 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on HELP.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Amendments (9)
S.AMDT.3104
To modify the list of eligible programs that may be subject to a performance partnership agreement.
S.AMDT.3110
To strengthen the Academic Achievement for All Demonstration Act (Straight A's Act).
S.AMDT.3111
To improve the bill.
S.AMDT.3117
To reform certain State requirements relating to the use of funds to improve student academic achievement and student performance and to coordinate professional development activities.
S.AMDT.3118
To provide for merit school programs for rewarding all teachers in schools that improve student achievement for all students.
S.AMDT.3122
To provide for class size reduction programs.
S.AMDT.3126
To improve the provisions relating to teachers.
S.AMDT.3127
To improve the bill.
S.AMDT.3139
To provide for early learning programs, and for other purposes.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor