+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On October 21, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Resources.
On October 5, 1998 in the House:
- Held at the desk.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Received in the House.
On October 2, 1998 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On September 8, 1998 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 543.
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 105-304 .
On September 2, 1998 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources requested executive comment from Department of the Interior, OMB.
On July 29, 1998 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On July 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Parks, Preservation and Recreation. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 105-662.
On April 28, 1998 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Parks, Preservation and Recreation.
On April 27, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor