+ − Summary
+ − Actions (17)
On June 19, 1979 in the Senate:
- Public Law 96-25.
- Signed by President.
On June 7, 1979 in the Senate:
- Measure presented to President.
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On June 7, 1979 in the House:
- Measure enrolled in House.
On June 5, 1979 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
- Senate agreed to House amendments.
On June 4, 1979 in the House:
- Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries discharged in House.
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure passed House, amended, in lieu of H. R. 3055 .
On May 30, 1979 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries.
On May 23, 1979 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate, amended.
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Call of calendar in Senate.
On May 15, 1979 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar in Senate.
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation with amendment, S. Rept. 96-147.
On January 23, 1979 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor