+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 4, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Government Reform.
- Received in the House.
On June 4, 2002 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On June 3, 2002 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On May 23, 2002 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 392.
- Committee on Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Lieberman without amendment. Without written report.
On May 22, 2002 in the Senate:
- Committee on Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On April 8, 2002 in the Senate:
- Committee on Governmental Affairs referred to Subcommittee on International Security, Proliferation and Federal Services.
On March 4, 2002 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Governmental Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor