+ − Summary
+ − Actions (5)
On April 13, 1988 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Patents, Copyrights and Trademarks. Incorporated provisions of this measure into S. 1301 which was approved for full committee consideration.
On March 3, 1988 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Patents, Copyrights and Trademarks. Hearings held.
On February 18, 1988 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Patents, Copyrights and Trademarks. Hearings held.
On January 25, 1988 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Patents, Copyrights and Trademarks.
On December 18, 1987 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor