+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On October 17, 1984 in the Senate:
- Pocket Vetoed by President.
On October 5, 1984 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On October 4, 1984 in the Senate:
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On October 2, 1984 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
On September 28, 1984 in the House:
- Placed on Union Calendar No: 614.
- Reported to House by House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs. Report No: 98-1094.
On September 26, 1984 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 27, 1984 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
On June 26, 1984 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendments by Voice Vote.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
- S.AMDT.3338 Amendment SP 3338 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
- S.AMDT.3338 Proposed by Senator Stevens for Senator Andrews. To make a technical correction.
On April 18, 1984 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 787.
- Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported to Senate by Senator Andrews under the authority of the order of Apr 13, 84 with amendments. With written report No. 98-406.
On April 9, 1984 in the Senate:
- Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
On March 7, 1984 in the Senate:
- Committee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 98-811.
On October 18, 1983 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.3338
To make a technical correction.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor