+ − Actions (10)
On June 8, 1982 in the House:
- House Requested a Conference and Speaker Appointed Conferees: Mitchell , Smith , Addabbo, Gonzalez, Richmond, Hatcher, Savage, McDade, Conte, Stanton, Broomfield, Williams .
- House Insisted on its Amendments by Unanimous Consent.
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House by Unanimous Consent.
On May 27, 1982 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
On May 18, 1982 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Regular Orders. Calendar No. 567.
- Committee on Small Business. Reported to Senate by Senator Weicker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 97-399.
On May 13, 1982 in the Senate:
- Committee on Small Business. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On March 4, 1982 in the Senate:
- Committee on Small Business. Hearings held.
On December 11, 1981 in the Senate:
- Read second time and referred to Senate Committee on Small Business.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor