+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On June 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- S.AMDT.2474 Amendment SA 2474 proposed by Senator Reid to Amendment SA 2473 . Of a perfecting nature.
- S.AMDT.2473 Amendment SA 2473 proposed by Senator Reid. To change the enactment date.
- Motion by Senator Reid to recommit to Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs with instructions to report back forthwith with the following amendment made in Senate.
- S.AMDT.2472 Amendment SA 2472 proposed by Senator Reid to Amendment SA 2471. Of a perfecting nature.
- S.AMDT.2471 Amendment SA 2471 proposed by Senator Reid to language proposed to be stricken by amendment no. SA 2468. To change the enactment date.
- S.AMDT.2470 Amendment SA 2470 proposed by Senator Reid to Amendment SA 2469. To change the enactment date.
- S.AMDT.2469 Amendment SA 2469 proposed by Senator Reid for Senator Pryor to Amendment SA 2468. To require the Government Accountability Office to study the effect of applying the mandatory purchase requirements to areas of residual risk, and to require the Administrator to study voluntary community-based flood insurance options.
- S.AMDT.2468 Amendment SA 2468 proposed by Senator Reid for Senator Johnson SD. In the nature of a substitute.
- Measure laid before Senate by motion.
- Motion to proceed to consideration of measure agreed to in Senate.
- Motion to proceed to measure considered in Senate.
- Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 96 - 2.
On June 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Cloture motion on the motion to proceed to the measure presented in Senate.
- Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate.
On June 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate.
- Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate.
On June 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate.
On June 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate.
On June 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate.
On June 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Motion to proceed to consideration of measure withdrawn in Senate.
- Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate.
- Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate.
On June 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Policy. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 112-698.
On May 9, 2012 in the Senate:
On December 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 250.
- Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Original measure reported to Senate by Senator Johnson SD. With written report No. 112-98 .
+ − Amendments (8)
S.AMDT.2468
In the nature of a substitute.
S.AMDT.2469
To require the Government Accountability Office to study the effect of applying the mandatory purchase requirements to areas of residual risk, and to require the Administrator to study voluntary community-based flood insurance options.
S.AMDT.2470
To change the enactment date.
S.AMDT.2471
To change the enactment date.
S.AMDT.2472
Of a perfecting nature.
S.AMDT.2473
To change the enactment date.
S.AMDT.2474
Of a perfecting nature.
S.AMDT.2475
Of a perfecting nature.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor