+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On October 21, 1988 in the House:
- For Further Action See H.R.4212 .
On September 23, 1988 in the House:
- Message on House action received in Senate and held at desk: House amendment to Senate bill.
On September 20, 1988 in the House:
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
On September 16, 1988 in the House:
- Placed on Union Calendar No: 557.
- Reported to House by House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs. Report No: 100-930.
On September 14, 1988 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On September 8, 1988 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On June 17, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands.
On June 7, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
On June 7, 1988 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On June 6, 1988 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment and an amendment to the Title by Voice Vote.
On May 27, 1988 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 703.
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Johnston without amendment and an amendment to the title. With written report No. 100-370.
On May 18, 1988 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources received executive comment from Interior Department. Favorable.
On April 28, 1988 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks. Hearings held.
On April 21, 1988 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources requested executive comment from Interior Department, OMB.
On December 9, 1987 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks.
On December 8, 1987 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor