+ − Summary
+ − Actions (6)
On September 28, 1976 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended.
On September 22, 1976 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs with amendment, H. Rept. 94-1655.
On December 2, 1975 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
On December 1, 1975 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate, amended.
On November 20, 1975 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs with amendment, S. Rept. 94-471.
On January 16, 1975 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor