+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On August 3, 1994 in the House:
- Held at the desk.
- Received in the House.
On August 3, 1994 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On August 2, 1994 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
On July 7, 1994 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 510.
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Johnston under the authority of the order of Jun 27, 94 with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 103-304.
On June 15, 1994 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On April 21, 1994 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 103-720.
On April 13, 1994 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources requested executive comment from Department of Agriculture, Department of the Interior, and Office of Management and Budget.
On March 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks.
On March 7, 1994 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor