+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On September 29, 1978 in the House:
- Senate agreed to House amendments with an amendment.
On September 12, 1978 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended, in lieu of H. R. 11622 .
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up by special rule in House.
On May 4, 1978 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Interstate and Foreign Commerce.
On May 3, 1978 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate, amended.
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Call of calendar in Senate.
On April 27, 1978 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation with amendment, S. Rept. 95-768.
On July 19, 1977 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor