+ − Summary
+ − Actions (14)
On October 27, 1986 in the Senate:
- Became Private Law No: 99-21.
- Signed by President.
On October 16, 1986 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On October 15, 1986 in the Senate:
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On October 8, 1986 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Senate agreed to House amendments by Voice Vote.
On October 7, 1986 in the House:
- Message on House action received in Senate and held at desk: House amendments to Senate bill.
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House by Unanimous Consent.
On March 27, 1986 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
On March 25, 1986 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 577.
- Committee on Labor and Human Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Hatch without amendment. Without written report.
On March 19, 1986 in the Senate:
- Committee on Labor and Human Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On December 4, 1985 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Labor and Human Resources.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor