+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On November 22, 2005 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 109-113.
- Signed by President.
On November 17, 2005 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On November 9, 2005 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 408 - 1 .
- Considered as unfinished business.
On November 8, 2005 in the House:
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1894 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Herger moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On October 20, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Received in the House.
On October 19, 2005 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor