+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On November 6, 1990 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 101-530.
- Signed by President.
On October 30, 1990 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On October 26, 1990 in the Senate:
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On October 22, 1990 in the House:
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- The chair announced that a second on the motion to suspend the rules is not required.
- Mr. Ackerman moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- Cleared for White House.
On October 12, 1990 in the House:
- Referred jointly to the House Committee on Armed Services.
- Referred jointly to the House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
- Received in the House.
On October 10, 1990 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
- S.AMDT.2946 Amendment SP 2946 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
- S.AMDT.2946 Proposed by Senator Murkowski for Senator Thurmond. To amend title 5, United States Code, to provide relief from certain inequities remaining in the crediting of National Guard technician service in connection with civil service retirement, and for other purposes.
- Senate Committee on Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
On November 16, 1989 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Governmental Affairs.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.2946
To amend title 5, United States Code, to provide relief from certain inequities remaining in the crediting of National Guard technician service in connection with civil service retirement, and for other purposes.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor