+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 20, 1992 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 102-262.
- Signed by President.
On March 12, 1992 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On March 11, 1992 in the Senate:
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On March 10, 1992 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On March 5, 1992 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Senate agreed to the House amendments by Voice Vote.
On March 4, 1992 in the House:
- Message on House action received in Senate and held at desk: House amendments to Senate bill.
On March 3, 1992 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Roe moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On February 26, 1992 in the House:
- Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 106.
- Reported by the Committee on Public Works + Transportation. H. Rept. 102-444.
On February 5, 1992 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On February 4, 1992 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On November 15, 1991 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Buildings and Grounds.
On October 31, 1991 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Public Works + Transportation.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Received in the House.
On October 30, 1991 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
- Senate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On October 29, 1991 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor