+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 15, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
On March 7, 2012 in the House:
- Received in the House.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
On March 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
- S.AMDT.1808 Amendment SA 1808 proposed by Senator Durbin for Senator Leahy. In the nature of a substitute.
- S.AMDT.1808 Amendment SA 1808 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
On December 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
- Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Leahy without amendment. Without written report.
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 253.
On November 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.1808
In the nature of a substitute.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor