+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 115-158. (TXT | PDF)
- Signed by President.
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate agreed to the House amendments to the Senate bill by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1738-1739)
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendments to Senate bill.
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 188.
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1418)
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1418-1419)
- Mr. Blum moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On September 21, 2017 in the House:
- Held at the desk.
- Received in the House.
On September 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On September 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5810; text: CR S5810)
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 37.
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. With written report No. 115-28.
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.