+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On September 7, 1977 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Interstate and Foreign Commerce.
On August 5, 1977 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate, amended.
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Measure called up by unanimous consent in Senate.
On August 4, 1977 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar in Senate under Measures Cleared to be Considered by Unanimous Consent.
On August 3, 1977 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation with amendment, S. Rept. 95-389.
On July 15, 1977 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor