+ − Actions (8)
On May 18, 1982 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Criminal Law. Approved for full committee consideration without amendment favorably.
On November 19, 1981 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Criminal Law. Hearings held.
On August 4, 1981 in the Senate:
- Committee on Judiciary received executive comment from U.S. Attorney General.
On June 8, 1981 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Criminal Law. Hearings held.
On May 18, 1981 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Criminal Law. Hearings held.
On February 10, 1981 in the Senate:
- Committee on Judiciary requested executive comment from U.S. Attorney General.
On February 5, 1981 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Criminal Law.
On January 21, 1981 in the Senate:
- Read second time and referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor