+ − Summary
+ − Actions (13)
On September 24, 1986 in the House:
- Unfavorable Executive Comment Received From DOT.
- Unfavorable Executive Comment Received From DOT.
On September 10, 1986 in the House:
- Unfavorable Executive Comment Received From Postal Service.
On July 15, 1986 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Merchant Marine.
- Executive Comment Requested from DOT, Postal Service.
On July 1, 1986 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Postal Personnel and Modernization.
On June 24, 1986 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
- Referred to House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries.
On June 20, 1986 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
On June 10, 1986 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 680.
- Committee on Commerce. Reported to Senate by Senator Danforth without amendment. With written report No. 99-321.
On March 13, 1986 in the Senate:
- Committee on Commerce. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On January 3, 1985 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor