+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On October 23, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
- Held at the desk.
- Received in the House.
On October 23, 2000 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 19, 2000 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- The committee substitute as amended agreed to by Unanimous Consent.
- S.AMDT.4333 Amendment SA 4333 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- S.AMDT.4333 Amendment SA 4333 proposed by Senator Sessions for Senator Hatch. To propose a substitute.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
On May 25, 2000 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 576.
- Committee on the Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Hatch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
On April 27, 2000 in the Senate:
- Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On November 4, 1999 in the Senate:
- Committee on the Judiciary. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 106-978.
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.4333
To propose a substitute.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor