+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On June 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 220.
- Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Leahy without amendment. With written report No. 110-90 . Additional and Minority views filed.
On June 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On May 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Committee on the Judiciary. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 110-145.
On January 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
On January 4, 2007 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor