+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (10)
On December 17, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
On October 22, 2007 in the House:
- Held at the desk.
- Received in the House.
On October 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 18, 2007 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On October 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 418.
- Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Biden without amendment. With written report No. 110-195 .
On September 11, 2007 in the Senate:
- Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On July 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
On July 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor