+ − Summary
+ − Actions (8)
On May 9, 1988 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Health and the Environment.
On May 2, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
On May 2, 1988 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On April 28, 1988 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
On April 27, 1988 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 639.
- Committee on Labor and Human Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Kennedy without amendment. Without written report.
On April 13, 1988 in the Senate:
- Committee on Labor and Human Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On October 28, 1987 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Labor and Human Resources.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor