+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 116-130. (TXT | PDF)
- Signed by President.
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate agreed to the House amendment to S.1822 by Unanimous Consent.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S1660)
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate bill.
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Mr. Pallone asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On passage Passed without objection. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR H1461-1464)
- H.Amdt.803 On agreeing to the Pallone amendment (A001) Agreed to without objection.
- H.Amdt.803 Amendment (A001) in the nature of a substitute offered by Mr. Pallone. (consideration: CR H1461-1464; text: CR H1461-1464)
- Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H1458-1464)
On December 19, 2019 in the House:
- Held at the desk.
On December 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On December 19, 2019 in the House:
- Received in the House.
On December 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- S.Amdt.1268 Amendment SA 1268 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- S.Amdt.1268 Amendment SA 1268 proposed by Senator Wicker. (consideration: CR S7180; text: CR S7215-7218) In the nature of a substitute.
- The committee substitute withdrawn by Unanimous Consent.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7178-7180)
On December 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 328.
- Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-174.
On July 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
+ − Amendments (4)
All Actions
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
H.Amdt.803
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
SA 1268
In the nature of a substitute.
S.Amdt.1268
In the nature of a substitute.
+ − Sponsors (70)
Type:
Primary Sponsor