+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On December 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 114-267. (TXT | PDF)
- Signed by President.
On December 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On November 29, 2016 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On passage Passed without objection. (text of measure as passed: CR H6356)
- Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H6355-6356)
- Mr. King (NY) asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider.
On November 17, 2016 in the House:
- Received in the House.
- Held at the desk.
On November 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On November 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S6418)
- S.Amdt.5108 Amendment SA 5108 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- S.Amdt.5108 Amendment SA 5108 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Heitkamp. (consideration: CR S6418; text: CR S6418)
- The committee substitute withdrawn by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6418)
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6417-6418; text of measure as reported in Senate: CR S6417-6418)
On October 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 269.
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 114-155.
On July 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On July 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
+ − Amendment
S.Amdt.5108
In the nature of a substitute.