+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 1, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on International Relations.
On January 23, 2002 in the House:
- Received in the House.
On January 23, 2002 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On December 20, 2001 in the Senate:
- S.AMDT.2695 Amendment SA 2695 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- S.AMDT.2695 Amendment SA 2695 proposed by Senator Reid for Senator Biden. To make certain managers' amendments to the bill.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 276.
On December 11, 2001 in the Senate:
- Committee on Foreign Relations. Original measure reported to Senate by Senator Biden. With written report No. 107-122 .
- Committee on Foreign Relations ordered to be reported an original measure.
On November 14, 2001 in the Senate:
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.2695
To make certain managers' amendments to the bill.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor