+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On September 17, 2004 in the House:
- Held at the desk.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Received in the House.
On September 15, 2004 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On July 7, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 611.
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Domenici with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 108-292 .
On June 16, 2004 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On January 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor