+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On December 14, 1993 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 103-193.
- Signed by President.
On December 8, 1993 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On November 23, 1993 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On passage Passed without objection.
- Considered by unanimous consent.
- Mr. Brooks asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
- Committee on Judiciary discharged.
- Rereferred to the House Committee on Judiciary.
- Committee on Public Works + Transportation discharged.
On November 21, 1993 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Public Works + Transportation.
- Received in the House.
On November 21, 1993 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On November 20, 1993 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Voice Vote.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor