+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 30, 2004 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On December 10, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
On December 1, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Employer-Employee Relations.
On November 18, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to House Judiciary
- Referred to House Education and the Workforce
- Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Received in the House.
On November 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On November 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On October 23, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 322.
- Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Hatch without amendment. Without written report.
- Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On October 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor